VEON Shareholders Elect New Members to its Board of Directors
News provided by
Share this article
Share this article
AMSTERDAM, June 10, 2021 /PRNewswire/ - VEON Ltd. (NASDAQ: VEON) (Euronext Amsterdam: VEON), a leading global provider of connectivity and internet services, announces the results of the elections conducted at its Annual General Meeting of Shareholders held earlier today.
Shareholders elected three new members to the Company s Board of Directors: Vasily Sidorov, Irene Shvakman and Sergi Herrero, who is currently serving as co-Chief Executive Officer of VEON and will step down in June. Shareholders also elected nine previously serving directors: Hans-Holger Albrecht, Leonid Boguslavsky, Mikhail Fridman, Gennady Gazin, Yaroslav Glazunov, Andrei Gusev, Gunnar Holt, Stephen Pusey and Robert Jan van de Kraats.
VEON Announces Annual General Meeting
Sergi Herrero and Irene Shvakman join Board slate
News provided by
Share this article
Share this article
AMSTERDAM, May 5, 2021 /PRNewswire/ VEON Ltd. (NASDAQ: VEON) and (Euronext Amsterdam: VEON), a leading global provider of connectivity and internet services, has today announced that its Board of Directors has set the date for the Company s Annual General Meeting of Shareholders for 10 June 2021. The record date for the 2021 Annual General Meeting has been set for 5 May 2021.
The Board of Directors and its Nominating and Corporate Governance Committee have recommended 12 individuals for the Board, including ten directors currently serving on the Board: Hans-Holger Albrecht, Leonid Boguslavsky, Mikhail Fridman, Gennady Gazin, Amos Genish, Yaroslav Glazunov, Andrei Gusev, Gunnar Holt, Stephen Pusey and Robert Jan van de Kraats.
Message :
Required fields
AMSTERDAM, May 5, 2021 /PRNewswire/ VEON Ltd. (NASDAQ: VEON) and (Euronext Amsterdam: VEON), a leading global provider of connectivity and internet services, has today announced that its Board of Directors has set the date for the Company s Annual General Meeting of Shareholders for 10 June 2021. The record date for the 2021 Annual General Meeting has been set for 5 May 2021.
The Board of Directors and its Nominating and Corporate Governance Committee have recommended 12 individuals for the Board, including ten directors currently serving on the Board: Hans-Holger Albrecht, Leonid Boguslavsky, Mikhail Fridman, Gennady Gazin, Amos Genish, Yaroslav Glazunov, Andrei Gusev, Gunnar Holt, Stephen Pusey and Robert Jan van de Kraats.
Frontier set to exit Chapter 11 on April 30 lightreading.com - get the latest breaking news, showbiz & celebrity photos, sport news & rumours, viral videos and top stories from lightreading.com Daily Mail and Mail on Sunday newspapers.
SHARE
To a non-New Yorker, 64th Street might look like a regular stretch of tightly compacted New York apartment buildings. But the buildings on 64th aren’t apartments, they’re some of New York’s finest townhouse mansions on the Upper East Side. Nestled between two brown and gray mansions on 64th stands the most opulent one Ken Laub’s Versailles an inspired Neo-Georgian brick townhouse extending 90 feet in depth. Laub, a semi-retired real estate magnate, has lived in the mansion for 35 years. Now, he’s selling his prized townhouse, downsizing and relocating in the city to focus on creative projects, some of which include his musical compositions.