Published: Mar 29, 2021
CAMBRIDGE, Mass. & MONTREAL (BUSINESS WIRE) Repare Therapeutics Inc. (“Repare” or the “Company”) (Nasdaq: RPTX), a leading clinical-stage precision oncology company enabled by its proprietary synthetic lethality approach to the discovery and development of novel therapeutics, today announced that each of its Executive Vice President and Chief Financial Officer, Steve Forte and its Executive Vice President and Chief Medical Officer, Maria Koehler (collectively, the “Executives”), have established Automatic Securities Disposition Plans (“ASDPs”) in accordance with applicable United States and Canadian securities legislation, including U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission (“SEC”) rule 10b5-1 and the recommended practices set forth in the recently issued Canadian Securities Administrators’ Staff Notice 55-317 (“Staff Notice 55-317”) and the Company’s internal policies.
Published: Apr 01, 2021
Software integration is touted as the most important therapeutic advancements, likely to yield promising results
Fact.MR, Rockville MD: The glaucoma diagnostics market is anticipated to post substantial gains through 2021 and beyond, as ophthalmic clinics resume elective surgeries in the post-pandemic scenario. Long-term prospects are expected to remain underpinned by immense promises exhibited by virtue of technological integration to fast-track surgical procedures and reduction of patient trauma.
According to a study published in the National Center for Biotechnology Information, global prevalence of glaucoma for the population aged 40-80 years is over 3%, with primary open angle glaucoma prevalence being the highest in Africa (4.2%), while incidence of primary angle closure glaucoma is the highest in Asia, at 1.1%. It was further established that the total number of glaucoma patients would rise to 76 million by 2020, and further to 111.8 million by
Published: Apr 01, 2021
CULVER CITY, Calif. (BUSINESS WIRE) ImmunityBio, Inc. (NASDAQ: IBRX), a clinical-stage immunotherapy company, today announced the appointment of health innovation expert and executive Linda Maxwell, M.D., MBA, as an independent member of the company’s board of directors. The company also appointed CEO Richard Adcock to the board; he was named CEO of NantKwest in October and remains the CEO of the company after the merger of NantKwest with ImmunityBio in March. Both appointments are effective March 29, 2021.
The nine-member ImmunityBio board is led by Founder and Executive Chairman Patrick Soon-Shiong, M.D. The board includes two other recently appointed outside members, former CIA director John Brennan and retired U.S. Army General Wesley Clark, along with current board members Michael Blaszyk, Cheryl Cohen, Christobel Selecky, and Barry Simon, M.D.
Published: Apr 01, 2021
MOUNTAIN VIEW, Calif. (BUSINESS WIRE) Takara Bio USA, Inc.., a wholly owned subsidiary of Takara Bio Inc., is collaborating with Indiana University of Pennsylvania (IUP), and Indiana Regional Medical Center (IRMC) to enable better and faster COVID-19 testing for rural communities in the United States and around the world.
Many rural communities have been struggling to keep up with the demand for COVID-19 testing. Although medical and laboratory personnel are doing their best to process samples, current detection protocols are expensive and slow, and they can expose laboratory personnel to the novel coronavirus (SARS-CoV-2). Furthermore, underserved communities have been hit especially hard by supply chain issues with sample processing components.
Published: Apr 01, 2021
HOPKINTON, Mass., April 1, 2021 /PRNewswire/ Lykan Bioscience, a contract development and manufacturing services organization and provider of the first true end-to-end solution for the manufacture of cell-based therapies, today announced the appointment of Patrick Lucy as its President & Chief Executive Officer, effective April 1, 2021. Patrick will assume day-to-day leadership of the Company and will also join Lykan s Board of Directors. Anthony Rotunno, Lykan s current CEO, will assume the role of Founder & Executive Vice Chairman and will continue to contribute to the growth of the Company.
Patrick Lucy becomes President and Chief Executive Officer Anthony Rotunno assumes role of Founder and Executive Vice Chair